Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2022 as amended on 09 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THEIR PARTICIPATION AND INVOLVEMENT WITH ALL ASPECTS OF THE PERFORMANCE OF EDUCATIONAL MUSICAL PRODUCTIONS INCLUDING THEATRE DANCE DRAMS MUSIC SINGING LITERATURE SCULPTURE AND PAINTING AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS GENERALLY.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.