Dogfen lywodraethu QUEEN ELIZABETH'S HOSPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAR 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 MAR 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF BRISTOL AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
CITY OF BRISTOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.