Trustees NOTTINGHAM CONTEMPORARY
Charity number: 1116670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bianca Alexandra Chu | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janine Catalano | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juan Sanchez | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Elizabeth Swift | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caragh Thuring | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Foster | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aicha Mehrez | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ruth Carey-Thomas | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Symonds | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.