Dogfen lywodraethu THE RENAL ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAR 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 APR 2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 NOV 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY: A. ADVANCING, COLLATING AND DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE OF RENAL STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION, RENAL DISEASE AND RENAL REPLACEMENT THERAPY; B. SEEKING MEANS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF RENAL DISORDERS; C. DEALING WITH ANY MATTERS CONCERNING THE WELFARE OF PATIENTS WITH RENAL DISEASES AND THE ORGANISATION OF SERVICES FOR THEIR RELIEF.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.