Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL LEARNING AND WORK INSTITUTE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 DEC 2015 as amended on 01 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ALL FORMS OF ADULT EDUCATION, AND THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF UNEMPLOYMENT AND POVERTY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.