Dogfen lywodraethu BIRMINGHAM ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1991, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28TH JULY 2005 AND 19 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 FEB 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDERS OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND(THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) HEREINAFTER CALLED MIND) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND
Maes buddion
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.