Dogfen lywodraethu DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2010 as amended on 15 Nov 2018 as amended on 15 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE SUPPORT OR PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT OR WORK), THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION OR ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN DERBYSHIRE
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.