Dogfen lywodraethu THE BROMLEY BY BOW CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCTOBER 1994 AND 19TH JULY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2020 as amended on 08 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS EITHER ALONE OR BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND ANY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
EAST LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.