Dogfen lywodraethu WOMEN'S ROYAL NAVAL SERVICE BENEVOLENT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 25 APR 1950 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 09 MAR 1960 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 24 MAY 1973 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 13 NOV 1975 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 21 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 20 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 09 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 19 JUL 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED AND INCORPORATED ARE: (A) TO PROVIDE RELIEF IN CASES OF NECESSITY OR DISTRESS AMONG THE WRNS MEMBERS OF THE TRUST AND AMONG THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO ACCEPT AND ADMINISTER ANY GIFT FOR ANY SPECIAL OR LIMITED OBJECT IN GENERAL ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS OF THE TRUST (SUCH GIFTS TO BE KNOWN AS "MINOR TRUST"); AND (B) TO MAKE PROVISION IN SUITABLE CASES FOR ASSISTANCE WITH FURTHER EDUCATION FOR WRNS MEMBERS OF THE TRUST.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.