Dogfen lywodraethu HUGGENS'S COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
THE INDENTURE OF SALE DATED 25 JULY 1844 AS SUPPLEMENTED BY THE ACT OF PARLIAMENT DATED 22 JULY 1847 AND COMMISSION SCHEMES DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1872, 26 OCTOBER 1906, 21 MAY 1946, 6 MAY 1949 AND 21 JUNE 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING IN THE FORM OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR OLDER PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (THE BENEFICIARIES); AND (B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CURRENT RESIDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.