Dogfen lywodraethu BARNARDO'S
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2011 as amended on 09 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 TO PROMOTE THE CARE, SAFETY AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY:- 1.1 SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THOSE IN NEED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 1.2 PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH; AND 1.3 ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION. 2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.