Dogfen lywodraethu CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WADSWORTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 02 MAY 1986 as amended on 19 Feb 2019 as amended on 10 Aug 2021 as amended on 09 Aug 2022 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR 6 POOR WIDOWS OF ANY AGE OR SPINSTERS OF 50 YEARS OF AGE OR OVER WHO HAVE BEEN BORN OR RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND PAYMENTS FOR SAME EACH QUARTER DAY. 2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
BRADSHAW, HOLDSWORTH,ILLINGWORTH AND ILLINGWORTH MOOR
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.