Dogfen lywodraethu LEE ABBEY INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JUNE 1963, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2003, 3 DECEMBER 2005 AND 28 OCTOBER 2008 AND 27 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAR 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE THROUGH THE MINISTRY OF COMMUNITIES OF CHRISTIANS WHOSE SHARED LIVES IN THE FELLOWSHIP OF THE HOLY SPIRIT COMMUNICATE THE LOVE OF GOD REVEALED IN JESUS CHRIST AND FOR EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE FURTHERANCE IN WAYS THAT ARE CHARITABLE, OF THE WELFARE OF STUDENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES, OR SUCH OF THEM AS MAY BE PROPER OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY
Maes buddion
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.