Dogfen lywodraethu LICHFIELD AND BILSTON DRILL HALLS TRUST FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 15 MAY 1972 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1984 SCHEME DATED 15/05/1972 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/01/2015 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
INCOME TO BE USED IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY OF THE EXISTING UNITS WHICH ARE:- (B COMPANY 2ND BATTALION, MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS, TERRITORIAL ARMY, HEADQUARTERS COMPANY AND C (STAFFORDSHIRE) COMPANY 1ST BATTALION MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS, TERRITORIAL ARMY AND 210 (STAFFORDSHIRE) AIR DEFENCE BATTERY ROYAL ARTILLERY, TERITORIAL ARMY); FOR SUCH CHAIRTABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CALCULATED TO FURTHER THEIR MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY IMPROVING THE FACILITIES AND AMENITIES OF TRAINING AND SERVICE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.