Dogfen lywodraethu EVELYN NORRIS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1968, SCHEMES OF THE 12 JANUARY 1978, 13 NOVEMBER 1986, AN ORDER DATED 23 JULY 2002 AND AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY INDIGENT MEMBERS OF THE CONCERT AND THEATRICAL PROFESSIONS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OF PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OF FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS, (2) PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONSTO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR UNDERTAKE TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.