Dogfen lywodraethu LONDON HOUSING FOUNDATION LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1975, AS AMENDED 23RD MARCH 1990 CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 18/4/1990. AS AMENDED 18/9/1995, 20/4/1999 AND 11/6/08 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED IS TO FACILITATE THE RELIEF, FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY COMMUNITY IN WHICH IT CHOOSES TO WORK, OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BOTH: (A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; AND (B) BY ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY DEEM FIT FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING, BUT NOT ONLY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Maes buddion
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.