Dogfen lywodraethu THE DECORATIVE ARTS SOCIETY 1850 TO PRESENT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 APRIL 1976, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1993, AND ORDER DATED 17 OCTOBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2005 as amended on 21 Apr 2022 as amended on 14 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE DECORATIVE ARTS FROM 1850 TO THE PRESENT DAY, PARTICULARLY IN GREAT BRITAIN, EUROPE AND THE USA, AND TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE, DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH SCHOLARLY RESEARCH INTO THE DECORATIVE ARTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.