Dogfen lywodraethu ST LUKE'S HOSPICE PLYMOUTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 1980, 7 JUNE 1993 AND 12 NOVEMBER 2002 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 14 SEPTEMBER 2010 as amended on 10 Aug 2020 as amended on 10 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL DISEASE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY WHETHER GEOGRAPHICAL OR OTHERWISE OF SUCH OBJECT)
Maes buddion
PLYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.