Dogfen lywodraethu THE QUEST TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/09/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PRIMARILY OF JEWISH CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY PROMOTING, PROVIDING, SUPPORTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES AT AKIVA SCHOOL AND OTHER SCHOOLS, PARTICULARLY THOSE FOR CHILDREN OF THE JEWISH FAITH.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.