Dogfen lywodraethu WATERAID
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1989, 24 SEPTEMBER 1997, 23 SEPTEMBER 1998, 9 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 4 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 16 Oct 2020 as amended on 28 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 The objects for which the Charity is established are, for the public benefit: 1.1.1 to relieve poverty and suffering in any part of the world through (i) the improvement of water supplies, sanitation and hygiene services, and (ii) providing advice on related health matters; and 1.1.2 to advance education concerning the nature, causes and effects of such poverty and suffering related to inadequate water supplies, sanitation and/or hygiene services. 1.2 Nothing in the objects shall authorise an application of property for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with s.7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.