Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL HOSPITAL FOR NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSURGERY DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 1984 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 JUNE 1990 AND 13 JULY 1994 AND 11 JANUARY 1996 as amended on 04 Jun 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AND DISEASE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF DISEASES OF THE NERVOUS SYSTEM, AND TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS OF MONEY PRIMARILY TO THE NATIONAL HOSPITALS FOR NERVOUS DISEASES BUT ALSO TO ANY OTHER HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND/OR TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION AS THE COUNCIL OF MANAGEMENT THINK FIT
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.