Dogfen lywodraethu ENGLISH FOLK DANCE AND SONG SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/11/1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 2016 as amended on 09 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1.1 TO PRESERVE ENGLISH FOLK DANCES AND SONGS AND OTHER FOLK MUSIC (INCLUDING SINGING GAMES), FOLK TALES AND FOLK DRAMA, TO MAKE THEM KNOWN AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PRACTICE OF THEM IN THEIR ORIGINAL FORMS; 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE THE KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF ENGLISH FOLK DANCES, SONGS AND MUSIC, TALES AND DRAMA BY MEANS OF DANCES, SCHOOLS CLASSES , EXAMINATIONS, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS, FESTIVALS AND OTHER LIKE METHODS; 2.2.3 TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO AND STUDY OF THE ORIGINS DEVELOPMENT AND TRADITIONAL PRACTICE OF ENGLISH FOLK DANCES, SONGS AND MUSIC TALES AND DRAMA AND THEIR RELATIONSHIP WITH THOSE OF OTHER COUNTRIES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.