Dogfen lywodraethu ORBIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION IN 29 SEPTEMBER 1997, 12 JUNE 2002 AND 22 DECEMBER 2005 as amended on 17 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2 The objects of the Charity are for the public benefit: 2.1 The relief of persons suffering from blindness, sight deficiencies or other medical conditions and the prevention and cure of blindness, sight deficiencies or other medical conditions by the provision of training, education and counselling; 2.2 The relief of sickness of persons suffering from blindness, sight deficiencies or other medical conditions by, but not limited to, the provision of healthcare services and medical treatment; 2.3 The conduct of research into the causes and cure of blindness, sight deficiencies and other medical conditions and the publication of the useful results of that research.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.