Dogfen lywodraethu SIR WALTER ST.JOHN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 28 FEB 1992 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 15 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 13 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 APR 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT INTHE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH, WITH A PEFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENTIN THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BATTERSEA, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE BENEFICIARIES) AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.