Governing document HOMELESS ACTION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TO PERSONS IN NEED AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.