Dogfen lywodraethu ProAge Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 SEP 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS OF LEADERSHIP AND MANAGEMENT AND THE TRAINING OF EFFECTIVE MANAGERS, LEADERS, CONTRIBUTORS AND INFLUENCERS, IN PARTICULAR TO RECOGNISE AND ASSESS THE CONTRIBUTION AND IMPACT FROM DIVERSE LEADERS AND MANAGERS IN THE HIGHER AGE BRACKETS (TYPICALLY THOSE AGED 50+); (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ADVANTAGES OF EFFECTIVE AND DIVERSE LEADERSHIP; AND (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR WISH TO BE IN POSITIONS OF LEADERSHIP OR INFLUENCE, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR AGE, DIVERSE BACKGROUND OR EXPERIENCE TO LEARN ABOUT AND DEVELOP LEADERSHIP SKILLS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.