Dogfen lywodraethu CITY OF HULL AND HUMBER ENVIRONMENT FORUM (CHEF)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 APRIL 1999 AND 7 MAY 2003, BY CERT OF INCORP UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23RD JUNE 2004 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 MARCH 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABILITY OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENTS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE COUNCIL, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE COUNCIL AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE COUNCIL BEING UNITARY AUTHORITIES IN ENGLAND. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABILITY.
Maes buddion
HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.