Dogfen lywodraethu The Collegiate School Bristol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/09/2015 as amended on 24 Aug 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND/OR GIRLS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF BRISTOL AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.