Dogfen lywodraethu CONNECT - THE COMMUNICATION DISABILITY NETWORK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP 21 DEC 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 18 JUNE 2000, 22 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 24 SEPT 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 DEC 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH APHASIA AND OTHER COMMUNICATION DISABILITIES AND THEIR CARERS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICES, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.