Dogfen lywodraethu INDEPENDENCE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAR 2016 as amended on 17 Aug 2020 as amended on 17 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE HEALTH, ESPECIALLY IN RELATION TO PEOPLE AT RISK BECAUSE OF ALCOHOL AND SUBSTANCE MISUSE OR BEHAVIOURS, MENTAL HEALTH OR COGNITIVE CONDITIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.