Dogfen lywodraethu QUENTIN BLAKE CENTRE FOR ILLUSTRATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JULY 2008 AND 15 JUNE 2009. as amended on 08 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF LITERARY ILLUSTRATION AND IN PARTICULAR BY OWNING, MANAGING AND OPERATING A MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY OPEN TO THE PUBLIC FOR THE DISPLAY AND STUDY OF THE WORKS OF QUENTIN BLAKE AND OTHER LITERARY ILLUSTRATORS AND ASSOCIATED PICTURES, DRAWINGS, SKETCHES AND ILLUSTRATIONS, WORKS OF LITERATURE, ARTEFACTS, AND OBJECTS D'ART.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.