Dogfen lywodraethu THE WOMEN'S CENTRE CORNWALL LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAY 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY BASED WOMEN’S CENTRE, BY WOMEN FOR WOMEN, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF WOMEN AND GIRLS. 2. TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF WOMEN AND TEENAGE GIRLS WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED OR ARE EXPERIENCING SEXUAL ABUSE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND/OR DOMESTIC ABUSE AND SUPPORT ALL VICTIMS TO ACCESS APPROPRIATE SERVICES. 3. TO EDUCATE AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THESE ISSUES. 4. TO TRAIN TO A PROFESSIONAL STANDARD ALL THOSE THAT WILL PROVIDE SERVICES THAT FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CORNWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.