Dogfen lywodraethu PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1 PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY 3.2 PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT 3.3 PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING 3.4 PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS 3.5 PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS 3.6 PROVIDING SERVICES TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CHARITY’
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.