Trustees AGE UK EALING
Charity number: 1100474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GRAHAM MUIR | Chair | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Brands Kent | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES MARTIN LOWE | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Janany Shanmugarajah | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Young | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Newton | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sudha Agrawal | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCO FRUZZA | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Satpal Chana | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.