Dogfen lywodraethu EAST LONDON MOSQUE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/05/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2015 as amended on 02 Nov 2019 as amended on 07 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MOSQUE IN LONDON. 2 ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY. 3 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.