Dogfen lywodraethu THE COVENTRY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 1970 AND AMENDED 2 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 03 APR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 08 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 DEC 2018 as amended on 12 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE CITY OF COVENTRY (I) TO PROMOTE THE ENVIRONMENTAL, SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL IMPROVEMENT OF COVENTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE LIVING AND WORKING HERE. (II) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, URBAN DESIGN AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING COVENTRY (III) TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE BUILT, LANDSCAPE AND ENVIRONMENTAL HERITAGE AND HISTORY OF COVENTRY (IV) TO PROMOTE HIGH QUALITY PUBLIC AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PEOPLE OF COVENTRY (V) TO PROMOTE HARMONIOUS RELATIONS AMONG THE COMMUNITY OF ALL RACES, BELIEFS AND CULTURES IN COVENTRY
Maes buddion
COVENTRY AND DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.