Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CENTRAL WOLVERHAMPTON
Charity number: 1130297
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Castle | Chair | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Anne Woolf | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Alero Nwaloko King | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Louise Ellis | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Joan Bickley | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Adeleke Talabi | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aliko Nelly Wilcox | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Whitney | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jennifer Bertaut | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Kirsty Rendell | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mavis Collins | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Hugh Alexander Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Anne Harrow | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annie Heppenstall | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neville Jonathan Collins | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Fairclough | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ray Gaston | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Bowden | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christopher O'Brien | Trustee |
|
||||||
Robert Johnson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Maud Lewis | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.