Trustees BROMLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1135594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Issacson | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elaine Sarah Colechin | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Helen Howard | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS EVE JOHNDON | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN NICHOLAS FELLINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.