Dogfen lywodraethu TRAFALGAR ENTERTAINMENT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2013 as amended on 25 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN ALL FORMS AND IN ASSOCIATED THEATRICAL ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.