Dogfen lywodraethu Services For Education Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/12/2015 as amended on 14 Jul 2020 as amended on 27 Jul 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF HIGH QUALITY TEACHING AND LEARNING; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CARE, SAFETY AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY: (A) SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THOSE IN NEED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (B) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH; (C) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND TEACHING OF MUSIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.