Dogfen lywodraethu THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAR 2019 as amended on 09 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OVER THE AGE OF 14 YEARS, IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEFINING, DEVELOPING, SUPPORTING AND ENHANCING FURTHER EDUCATION GOVERNANCE, AND THE PROFESSIONALISM OF FURTHER EDUCATION PRACTITIONERS, LEADERS AND MANAGERS; (2) IMPROVING THE EXPERIENCE AND OUTCOMES OF LEARNING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO, AND ENHANCEMENT OF PROFESSIONALISM IN, THE FURTHER EDUCATION WORKFORCE; (3) DEVELOPING AND SUPPORTING A RECOGNISED, PROFESSIONAL AND UP TO DATE WORKFORCE THROUGH ACTING AS A CUSTODIAN OF AGREED STANDARDS FOR STAFF IN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR, AND ACTING AS A FURTHER EDUCATION STANDARD SETTING BODY FOR RELEVANT QUALIFICATIONS IN RELATION TO TEACHING, LEARNING, ASSESSMENT AND SUPPORTING ROLES; (4) SUPPORTING AND ENABLING HIGH QUALITY, APPROPRIATE AND FOCUSSED CONTINUOUS PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYEES IN THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR; AND (5) PROMOTING AND CHAMPIONING DIVERSITY AND EQUALITY ACROSS THE FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.