Dogfen lywodraethu FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JUNE 1984, AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1989, 1 DECEMBER 1995, 16 MARCH 1999 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 JAN 2012 as amended on 08 Nov 2018 as amended on 01 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects are specifically restricted to advancing such purposes which are exclusively charitable under the laws of England and Wales, as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion determine, for the public benefit, and in particular (but not exclusively) for those in need due to their age, housing need, and/or mental or physical illness, including (but not limited to): 3.1 the prevention or relief of poverty, financial hardship or other charitable need (including, but not limited to, through the provision of social housing); 3.2 the relief of sickness and the preservation of health; 3.3 the relief of unemployment in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment; 3.4 the advancement of education in such ways as the Trustees think fit, including (but not limited to) providing support, advice, therapy and training to those in need; 3.5 promoting the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and the effective use of charitable resources (for the purposes of this object, charities are organisations which are established for exclusively charitable purposes in accordance with the laws of England and Wales).
Maes buddion
YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER REGION.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.