Dogfen lywodraethu TIN ARTS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 NOV 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS: 1.1 TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PARTICIPATION AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSIC; AND 1.2 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.