Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHERN COLLEGE (UNITED REFORMED AND CONGREGATIONAL)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 25/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/09/1970 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/10/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/07/2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE COLLEGE IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCHES BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR: 1) CANDIDATES FOR THE MINISTRIES OF THE CHURCHES, 2) MINISTERS OF, AND LAY PEOPLE IN, THE CHURCHES, AND 3) MINISTERS AND LAY PERSONS FROM OTHER DENOMINATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.