Dogfen lywodraethu THE CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOL RIPON LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 MARCH 1963, 16TH DECEMBER 1968, 1ST JUNE 1981 AND 16 DECEMBER 1996, 25TH FEBRUARY 2003 AND 10TH DECEMBER 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHORISTERS OF RIPON CATHEDRAL CHOIR AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT AND CARRY ON SCHOOLS PROVIDING A CLASSICAL, MATHEMATICAL, SCIENTIFIC MUSICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN OF ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY SUBJECT TO THE FUNDAMENTAL CONDITION THAT RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION GIVEN AT SUCH SCHOOLS SHALL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.