Dogfen lywodraethu THE SAMUEL COURTAULD TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/08/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE INSTITUTE AND THE UNIVERSITY OR OTHERWISE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF AND INTEREST IN THE HISTORY OF ART AND ARCHAEOLOGY CRITICISM OF ART AND ARCHAEOLOGY AND CONSERVATION OF WORKS OF ART.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.