Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR CALDERDALE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUN 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JAN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE SUPPORT OR PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT OR WORK), THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF CALDERDALE AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.