Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL EXAMINATION BOARD IN OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 APR 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING BY THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF HEALTH, SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AT WORK IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH STUDY AND COMPETENCE IN RISK MANAGEMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.