Dogfen lywodraethu AGE UK EXETER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/05/2011 as amended on 23 Oct 2019 as amended on 12 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 The objects of the Charity are to promote the following purposes for the benefit of the public and/or older people in and around Exeter (herinafter called 'the area of benefit'). 3.2.1 preventing or relieving the poverty or loneliness of older people. 3.2.2 advancing education 3.2.3 preventing or relieving sickness, disease or suffering in older people (whether emotional, mental or physical) 3.2.4 promoting equality and diversity 3.2.5 promoting the human rights of older people in accordance with the Universal Declaration of Human Rights 3.2.6 assisting older people, or their carers, in need by reason of ill-health, social exclusion or other disadvantage; and 3.2.7 such other charitable purposes for the benefit of older people as the Charity Trustees from time to time decide.
Maes buddion
CITY OF EXETER AND ITS ENVIRONS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.