Dogfen lywodraethu TRINITY COLLEGE LONDON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUL 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE PERFORMING AND CREATIVE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY PROMOTING EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION AND EDUCATIONAL ASSESSMENT IN: THE PERFORMING AND CREATIVE ARTS; AND LANGUAGE AND COMMUNICATION.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.